Ghert, Michelle Aileen (CPSO#: 79646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Vanderbilt University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
B3 Department of Surgery
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64089
Fax: (905) 381-7071
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Ghert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghert ( CPSO# 79646 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE AILEEN GHERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2005