Ghesquiere, Mark Herry (CPSO#: 62121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 West Street
Suite 201
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone: (519) 428-0442
Fax: (844) 708-7572
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark H. Ghesquiere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghesquiere ( CPSO# 62121 )

Business Address:
201 - 216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 428-0442

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HERRY GHESQUIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHESQUIERE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991