Ghoche, Roger (CPSO#: 86199)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital MCL 8-433 399 Bathurst Street Toronto, ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 17 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2014