Gholoum, Bassam Yacoub Jasem (CPSO#: 69594)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Aug 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002