Ghosh, Ananda (CPSO#: 90549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
358 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L9
Phone: (905) 844-5346
Fax: (905) 849-6551
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANANDA GHOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013