Ghosh, Caroline (CPSO#: 82371)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sheffield, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 May 2005 to 15 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Jun 2005 to 15 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006