Ghosh, Jayati (CPSO#: 92526)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ranchi University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 23 May 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011