Ghosh, Rishi Kesh (CPSO#: 77662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: 416-400-7676
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 4164007676
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rishi Ghosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghosh ( CPSO# 77662 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 400-7676

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RISHI KESH GHOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007