Ghuman, Jaspinder (CPSO#: 81613)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghuman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 9 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2009