Ghumman, Amena Ejaz (CPSO#: 100591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room B9-108
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 646-6227
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Habeeb and Ghumman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghumman ( CPSO# 100591)
Dr. S. Habeeb ( CPSO# 97737 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Care Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6770

Business Address:
Schulich School of Medicine
Room M103
1151 Richmond Street North
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone Number: (519) 661-2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMENA EJAZ GHUMMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHUMMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2017