Giaccone, Roberto Antonio (CPSO#: 58384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 306
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 723-8733
Fax: (613) 723-2925
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Giaccone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Giaccone ( CPSO# 58384 )

Business Address:
306 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 723-8733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTO ANTONIO GIACCONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIACCONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988