Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Giammarco, Rosetta (CPSO#: 51412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 808
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 523-5788
Fax: (905) 523-7880
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rose Giammarco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Giammarco ( CPSO# 51412 )

Business Address:
Suite 808
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-5788

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSETTA GIAMMARCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIAMMARCO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1985