Giammichele, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 18664)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005