Giancola, Lina (CPSO#: 63514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Giancola and A. Levitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Giancola ( CPSO# 63514 )
Dr. A. Levitt ( CPSO# 55988 )

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-9044

Business Address:
Suite FG03
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5307

Business Address:
607 Brair Hill Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 782-3922

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINA GIANCOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIANCOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006