Giancola, Sergio Benedetto (CPSO#: 72311)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006