Giang, Hudson Khai Hue (CPSO#: 57604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario
K8N 5A9
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: 613 969 5511 Ext. 2622
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 653-1140 Ext. 2120
Fax: (705) 653-0828
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hudson K. H. Giang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Giang ( CPSO# 57604 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K9N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-5511

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUDSON KHAI HUE GIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992