Gibb, Paul Stewart (CPSO#: 69947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Gibb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gibb ( CPSO# 69947 )

Business Address:
City of Lakes Family Health Team
Pioneer Manor Site
Unit C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL STEWART GIBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998