Gibb, Robert Alan (CPSO#: 31786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4411 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1K4
Phone: (519) 944-7811
Fax: (519) 944-6105
Electoral District: 01

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 1, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Alan Gibb, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gibb to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                                    DR.  ROBERT ALAN GIBB
                                          ("Dr. Gibb") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Gibb, certificate of registration number 31786, am a member of the
                  College. The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that the College received information from the
                  NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215577 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that further to the Investigation, I entered
                  into an undertaking with the College dated June 23, 2017. ("NMS
                  Undertaking").

            (5)   I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that as of January 1, 2018 this Undertaking
                  becomes effective and my obligations under the NMS Undertaking are
                  suspended.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective January 1, 2018.

            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake that, effective January 1, 2018, I will
                        restrict my practice to Occupational Medicine, Sports Medicine and
                        Surgical Assist.
                  
            (8)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that , effective January 1, 2018 , I will
                        execute the Prescribing Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which
                        is attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibb, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter
                        to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or
                        renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                        substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27);
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to refer all patients to whom I am
                        prescribing any of the substances described in section (8)(c),
                        above, to other physicians for assessment and care prior to January
                        1, 2018.

                  (e)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to
                        other physicians pursuant to section (8)(d), above (the "Log"). I,
                        Dr. Gibb, undertake to include in the Log the name of each patient
                        referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the date of
                        referral.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake that, effective January 1, 2018, I will return any
                  supplies of the substances referred to in section (8)(c) above that are
                  presently in my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and
                  secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12,
                  "Prescribing Drugs."

            (10)  I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (11)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake that effective January 1, 2018, I shall post
                        a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination and
                        consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                        and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."  For
                        further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Gibb has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the
                        following:
                        -     Narcotic Drugs;
                        -     Narcotic Preparations;
                        -     Controlled Drugs;
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances; and
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs.
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca.

                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "E."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gibb, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
            (12)  Resumption of Family Practice and Prescribing

                  (a)   I will not practise family medicine or resume prescribing in any
                        jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions
                        have been met:
                  
                        (i)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the
                              College of my intent to resume prescribing of the substances
                              referred to in paragraph 8(c) and/or to resume the practice
                              of family medecine;
                        (ii)  I prepare to resume with any remaining obligations
                              outstanding from the NMS Undertaking; and
                        (iii) The College approves my resumption of prescribing of the
                              substances referred to in paragraph 8(c) and/or my return to
                              the practice of family medicine and to prescribing.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (18)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Effective January 1, 2018, Dr. Gibb has voluntarily
                              restricted his practice to Industrial Medicine.
                  
                              Effective January 1, 2018, Dr. Gibb has agreed not to issue
                              new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or
                              administer any of the following substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                              (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27);
                              (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                               (v)  All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                    Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c.
                                    22);
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                              Dr. Gibb must post a clearly visible sign* effective January
                              1, 2018, in the waiting rooms and each examination and
                              consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as
                              follows:
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Gibb has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the
                              following:
                              -     Narcotic Drugs;
                              -     Narcotic Preparations;
                              -     Controlled Drugs;
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances; and
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs.
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Gibb, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Gibb, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Gibb, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (23)  I, Dr. Gibb, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with  any information  the College has  that  led  to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 1, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Alan Gibb to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 1, 2018:

Effective January 1, 2018, Dr. Gibb has voluntarily restricted his practice to Industrial Medicine.

Effective January 1, 2018, Dr. Gibb has agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);


(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Gibb must post a clearly visible sign¸ effective January 1, 2018, in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Gibb has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:

Narcotic Drugs;
Narcotic Preparations;
Controlled Drugs;
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances; and
All other Monitored Drugs.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca


Source: Member
Active Date: June 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Alan Gibb to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 23, 2017:
The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Gibb’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Gibb failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Gibb’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Gibb will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Gibb’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.