Giblon, Barnett Israel (CPSO#: 16200)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2006

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 10, 2006, Dr. Barnett Israel Giblon gave an undertaking to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to resign from Membership
in theCollege effective May 31, 2006, and to not apply for Registration
as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or in any
other jurisdiction worldwide.