Gibney, Patrick Francis (CPSO#: 29666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 357-6636
Fax: (905) 357-5592
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Gibney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gibney ( CPSO# 29666 )

Business Address:
306 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 357-6636

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK FRANCIS GIBNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1977