Gibson, Glenn Craig (CPSO#: 24121)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn C. Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Glenn Craig Gibson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 16, 2016:

Dr. Gibson was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice and is incompetent. After the investigation, Dr. Gibson resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)