Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gibson, John Malcolm Stirling (CPSO#: 21366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
P O Box 428
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MALCOLM STIRLING GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968