Gibson, Neil Edward (CPSO#: 60664)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2000