Gibson, Paul James (CPSO#: 83871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd. E
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J. Gibson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gibson ( CPSO# 83871 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8494

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Dec 2005 to 25 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 28 Jan 2006 to 24 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2008