Gibson, Rebecca Dianne (CPSO#: 82572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Gloucester ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: (613) 244-4400
Fax: (613) 244-3399
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA DIANNE GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009