Giddings, Gordon Rudolph (CPSO#: 78023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alabama, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2700-10020 100 St NW
Edmonton AB  T5J 0N3
Phone: 1-800-561-3899
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

665 Maitland Street
London ON  N5Y 2V7
Canada
Phone: 519-433-4055
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Giddings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Giddings ( CPSO# 78023 )

Business Address:
Suite 16
556 Bryne Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON RUDOLPH GIDDINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDDINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004