Giddy, William Henry (CPSO#: 21650)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1995