Gideon, Carol Annette (CPSO#: 62168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 100
79 Lynden Road
Lynden ON  L0R 1T0
Phone: (519) 647-3422
Fax: (519) 647-2901
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANNETTE GIDEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDEON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991