Gidwani, Ram Nanikram (CPSO#: 23980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5270
Fax: (519) 383-7274
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.N. Gidwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gidwani ( CPSO# 23980 )

Business Address:
Blue Water Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7Y 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500


Corporation Name: A.S. Jose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAM NANIKRAM GIDWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDWANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971