Gieg, Gordon George (CPSO#: 62072)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 17 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Nov 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994