Giesbrecht, Janice Louise (CPSO#: 52396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 988-5776
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice Giesbrecht Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Giesbrecht ( CPSO# 52396 )

Business Address:
219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Phone Number: (905) 685-8082

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 682-6451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE LOUISE GIESBRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIESBRECHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1985