Giglia, Lucia Giuseppa (CPSO#: 72839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
Hsc 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73584
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCIA GIUSEPPA GIGLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIGLIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 18 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2002