Gignac, Elise Anne (CPSO#: 54101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISE ANNE GIGNAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIGNAC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1985