Giguere, Caroline (CPSO#: 78762)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Mar 2003 to 20 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005