Giguere, David (CPSO#: 71326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  7:30  p.m.,  January  6,  2012,  the  following is imposed as a term,
            condition and limitation on the certificate of registration  held  by Dr. David
            Giguere, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.  Giguere to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I have ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.
                  
            The  following  terms,  conditions  and  limitations  continue  to apply to Dr.
            Giguere's certificate of registration.  (Note that (1) and (2) are  inoperative
            while Dr. Giguere's cease to practise undertaking remains in force.):

            (1)  Dr.  DAVID  GIGUERE  shall  practise  medicine  only  as  required  by the
            postgraduate  medical  education  program  in  which Dr. GIGUERE is enrolled at
            UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

            (2) Dr. GIGUERE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
            clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated  with  the  department where
            Dr. GIGUERE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate  trainees
            are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate
            medical education;

            (3) Dr. GIGUERE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

            (4)  The  certificate  expires on the earlier of the following times: when  Dr.
            GIGUERE is no longer enrolled  in  a  program of postgraduate medical education
            provided by a medical school in Ontario,  or  when  Dr. GIGUERE no longer holds
            Canadian  citizenship,  permanent  resident  status  or  a   valid   employment
            authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

            (5) This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.