Gilas, Thomas (CPSO#: 50638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 402
K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 778-5522
Fax: (416) 778-9424
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Gilas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gilas ( CPSO# 50638 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 402
K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 778-5522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS GILAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1985