Gilbart, Michael Kenneth (CPSO#: 69102)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2003