Gilbert, Carolyn Ann (CPSO#: 32181)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: Meghji, Carolyn Ann (used until: 08 Jan 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 May 2004