Gilbert, Francois (CPSO#: 78557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Stillview Avenue
Pointe-Claire QC  H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2015