Gilbert, Jane Catherine (CPSO#: 61263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Bear Clinic
243 North Service Road West
Suite 204
Oakville ON  L6M 3E5
Phone: (905) 844-4673
Fax: (905) 844-4671
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 22 Dec 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Dr. Jane Catherine Gilbert (October 4, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Gilbert’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Gilbert engaged in the sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct through acts including but not limited to socializing with Patient A and engaging in physical and/or sexual contact with Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., December 22, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints
            and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Jane Catherine Gilbert:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (I)   Dr. Gilbert shall not engage in any professional encounter, in person or
                  otherwise (the "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a registered health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                  Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Gilbert may not be alone
                  with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional
                  Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                  present. 

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Gilbert shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Gilbert's Professional Encounters with
                        patients.  It is Dr. Gilbert's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of her Professional Encounters with
                        patients, is unobstructed at all times;  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B", while
                        observing Dr. Gilbert in all her Professional Encounters with
                        patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the
                        form attached as Appendix "C" (the "Log");
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Gilbert shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Gilbert shall inform the College of each and every location that she
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, she
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location;

            Posting a Sign and Translations
            (v)   Dr. Gilbert shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of her Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "D" that
                  states: "Dr. Jane Catherine Gilbert must not have professional
                  encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in
                  the continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a
                  practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                  Ontario. Dr. Gilbert must not be alone during any professional encounter
                  with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website
                  at www.cpso.on.ca." 

            (vi)  Dr. Gilbert shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which she provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of her
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (vii) Dr. Gilbert shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Gilbert shall ensure that each patient with whom she has a
                  Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional
                  Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in (i), above. 

            (ix)  With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Gilbert shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in (i) above.

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Gilbert shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Gilbert's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xi)  Dr. Gilbert shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of her Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Gilbert's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order;

            (xii) Dr. Gilbert shall consent to the College providing any and all
                  information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their
                  Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Gilbert's compliance with the
                  terms of this Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Gilbert shall consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Gilbert's compliance with
                  this Order; and

            (xiv) Dr. Gilbert shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where she practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of her compliance with this Order.