Gilbert, Mark David (CPSO#: 27836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3136 N. Swan Rd.
Tucson, Az
85712
Tucson AZ  85712
United States
Phone: (520) 867-8720
Fax: (520) 320-1998

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1975