Gilchrist, Christopher Robert James (CPSO#: 98492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Medicine
Teaching Unit
7th Floor
101 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900 Ext. 6
Fax: (905) 272-9977
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 0V7
Canada
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: (905) 698-1022
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROBERT JAMES GILCHRIST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILCHRIST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014