Giles, Brenda-Louise (CPSO#: 64076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Parker, Brenda-Louise (used until: 25 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1999