Giles, Kathryn Anne (CPSO#: 56762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 603
73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L6
Phone: (519) 624-0129
Fax: (519) 624-4928
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Giles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Giles ( CPSO# 56762 )

Business Address:
603 - 73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L6
Phone Number: (519) 624-0129

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987