Giles, Sarah Mair (CPSO#: 83115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ER Dept
Lake of the Woods Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: 807 468-9861
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Giles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Giles ( CPSO# 83115 )

Business Address:
3 Gaetz Drive
Hay River NT  X0E 0R8
Phone Number: (867) 874-7201

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
27 MacKenzie Drive
Norman Wells NT  X0E 0V0
Phone Number: (867) 587-3650

Business Address:
P.O. Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MAIR GILES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007