Gilic, Filip (CPSO#: 82919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
242 King St
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Phone: (613) 392-2541
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilic ( CPSO# 82919 )

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X1
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILIP GILIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)