Gill, Dilip Singh Ramesses (CPSO#: 99756)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jan 2013 to 14 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Feb 2013 to 30 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2013