Gill, Kimberlee Dawn (CPSO#: 33263)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberlee Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 24 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Medical Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Email: medicalrecords@docudavit.com Telephone: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 11 Mar 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014