Gill, Kulvinder Kaur (CPSO#: 84436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 517
2250 Boivard Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 452-0015
Fax: (905) 452-1309
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 220
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Canada
Phone: (289) 878-8664
Fax: (905) 452-1309
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kulvinder Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 84436 )

Business Address:
Suite 517
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 452-0015

Business Address:
Suite 220
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (289) 878-1309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULVINDER KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2010 to 17 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012