Gill, Natasha Kaur (CPSO#: 96077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre St
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone: 519-925-0017
Fax: 519-925-6717
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.S. Grover Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Grover ( CPSO# 84970 )
Dr. N. Gill ( CPSO# 96077 )

Business Address:
Suite 132
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 938-5644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014